Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patrick J Layman, against Milner, Karen D., represented by Kristy A Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions294 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time313 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: May 20, 2016Answer filed.
Date: September 09, 2015Statement of Venue filed.
Date: July 31, 2015Complaint filed.
Date: July 31, 2015Summons filed.
Date: July 31, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: August 13, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.