Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patrick J Layman, against Castellanos, Erik, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions515 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time536 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: December 27, 2016Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: January 04, 2016Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: December 27, 2016Declaration - Other (Calculation of Accrued Interest) filed.
Date: December 27, 2016Declaration - Other (Non-Military Service) filed.
Date: December 27, 2016Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed.
Date: December 27, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.