Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Deborah Harvego, against Potter, Weston, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1299 days |
Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: June 15, 2016Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: February 19, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed.
Date: November 12, 2015Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: July 13, 2016Summons filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: November 12, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: November 12, 2015Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.