Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Quintana, Jennifer, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robert A Heintz, against Does 1-100, Biscocho, Martin, Biscocho, Allan, represented by James T Harry, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David De Alba presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1123 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1127 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (filed by defendant) filed.
Date: August 27, 2018Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Motion for Continuance of Trial filed.
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Request - Other (Request to Continue MSC) filed.
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: May 01, 2017Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: June 19, 2017Notice of Entry - Other (of Order Granting Mtn to Continue Trial) filed.
Date: April 06, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.