Martinez, Denise,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Edward A Schade,
against
Does 1 To 25,
North, Israel,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Details for
Martinez, Denise v. Does 1 To 25
, et al.
Case Events for
Martinez, Denise v. Does 1 To 25
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
April 05, 2018
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program heard on 04/05/2018 08:30:00 AM .
April 05, 2018
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/30/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause in RE: Dismissal has been generated .
Judge: David W. Abbott
April 05, 2018
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/30/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
Judge: David W. Abbott
April 05, 2018
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program rescheduled to 08/30/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: David W. Abbott
April 05, 2018
Docket Event
Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
April 05, 2018
Docket Event
Court orders sanctions against Edward A Schade in the sum of $ 150.00, payable to Court by 04/20/2018. Sanctions imposed for failure to file an Attorney Compliance Statement.
April 05, 2018
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program continued to 08/30/2018 at 08:30 in this department.
April 05, 2018
Docket Event
Court orders sanctions against Edward A Schade in the sum of $ 150.00, payable to Court by 04/20/2018. Sanctions imposed for failure to appear.
April 03, 2018
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal filed.
April 03, 2018
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .