Xiong, Ying,
Cha, Chuck,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Daniel S Robinson,
against
Walker, Donald,
Does 1-10,
Bershell, Brandi,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Xiong, Ying v. Walker, Donald
, et al.
Case Events for
Xiong, Ying v. Walker, Donald
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
September 24, 2015
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/18/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
September 24, 2015
Docket Event
Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
September 18, 2015
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal filed.
September 18, 2015
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
September 18, 2015
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
July 31, 2015
Docket Event
Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/31/2015 .
July 31, 2015
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
July 31, 2015
Docket Event
Summons filed.
July 31, 2015
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/18/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .