Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Air Systems Of Sacramento Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by David H Bartholomew, against Does 1-75, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, Sutter Medical Center Sacramento, The Boldt Company A Wisconsin Corporation, represented by Bennett J Lee, Tyson M. Shower, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions218 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time233 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: February 03, 2016Answer filed.
Date: September 08, 2015Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: August 05, 2015Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens filed.
Date: August 21, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed.
Date: September 08, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.