Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lee, Michelle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Louis G Beary, against Does 1-20, Bianco, Judith, represented by Peggy L Woo, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions499 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time503 days |
Order on Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed.
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: October 24, 2016Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: November 10, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed.
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Declaration of Due Diligence filed.
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.