Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Redmon, Jasiah, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Steven L Mazza, against Does 1 Through 50, Savemart Supermarkets, represented by Karen L Jacobsen, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 23, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1038 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1039 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: August 02, 2017Order - Other (Order Granting Stipulated Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00Stipulation (for Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2016-02-04T00:00:00Statement - Other (in Support of Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: August 03, 2017Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: April 26, 2018Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/28/2017 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/24/2016 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: July 27, 2017Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: July 11, 2017Correspondence (Confirming letter drop 2/23/17 hearing) filed.
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.