Froats, Kristina,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Peter J Kozak,
against
Urita, Edilberto,
Does 1-10,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Details for
Froats, Kristina v. Urita, Edilberto
, et al.
Case Events for
Froats, Kristina v. Urita, Edilberto
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
June 01, 2016
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
June 01, 2016
Docket Event
Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
May 16, 2016
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal filed.
May 16, 2016
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
May 16, 2016
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
July 09, 2015
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood
June 24, 2015
Docket Event
Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/24/2015 .