Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Matthew W Quall, against Does 1 Through 100, Hurst, Amanda K., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 22, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions113 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time252 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: June 22, 2015Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: February 29, 2016Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: October 13, 2015Complaint filed.
Date: June 22, 2015Summons filed.
Date: June 22, 2015Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: July 28, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.