Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Matthew W Quall, against Does 1 Through 100, Lewis, Shavaugn, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 22, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions273 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time273 days |
Answer filed.
Date: July 24, 2015Request for Dismissal (Does 1-100) filed.
Date: March 21, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00Amended Answer filed.
Date: July 30, 2015Judgment - Stipulation Only filed.
Date: March 21, 2016Order - Other (Stipulation for Entry of Judgment and Order Thereon) filed.
Date: March 21, 2016Stipulation (For entry of Judgment and Order thereon) filed.
Date: March 09, 2016Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: July 15, 2015Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: July 30, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.