Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lobel Financial Corp, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gary Dean Lobel, against Does 1 To 10, Thorpe, Roman D., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 18, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions96 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time314 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: March 14, 2016Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: September 22, 2015Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: March 14, 2016Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: September 22, 2015Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed.
Date: September 22, 2015Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: April 27, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.