Case Last Refreshed: 30 minutes ago
California Bank & Trust, Filed By: California Bank & Trust, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jamie P Dreher, against Does 1 Through 50, Tucker, Duane, Tucker, Marcia, Vss Countertops Inc, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts Superior with Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond M. Cadei Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2015 |
Category(Breach Of Contract/Warranty) |
|
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions258 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time350 days |
This is a complaint by a bank against two companies, VSS and I.E.T., and an individual, Victor S. Siegel, seeking payment of amounts due and owing pursuant to a loan agreement and guarantee, and asking the court for a declaratory judgment that, among...
Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc.
Date: June 26, 2015Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 09, 2015Order Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment After Hearing (Duane Tucker)
Date: July 29, 2015Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: June 26, 2015Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Application
Date: June 26, 2015Bond/Undertaking
Date: July 30, 2015Order Stipulation and Order to Stay Proceedings
Date: September 22, 2015Order Order for Writ of Possession
Date: July 29, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 18, 2015Declaration of Raye Ann Johnson in Support of Application
Date: June 26, 2015Application for Writ of Possession
Date: June 26, 2015Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery
Date: June 26, 2015Minute Order
Date: July 29, 2015Order Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment After Hearing (VSS Countertops)
Date: July 29, 2015Order Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Thereon
Date: March 02, 2016Complaint
Date: June 18, 2015Summons
Date: June 18, 2015Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: June 19, 2015Stipulation and Order To Stay Proceeding
Date: September 16, 2015Order - Other (Order for Writ of Possession) filed.
Date: July 29, 2015Application for Writ of Possession filed.
Date: June 26, 2015Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: July 09, 2015Declaration - Other (of Raye Ann Johnson in Support of Application) filed.
Date: June 26, 2015Stipulation and Order - Other (To Stay Proceeding) filed.
Date: September 16, 2015Order - Other (Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Thereon) filed.
Date: March 02, 2016Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing filed.
Date: June 26, 2015Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to Stay Proceedings) filed.
Date: September 22, 2015Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Application) filed.
Date: June 26, 2015Undertaking filed.
Date: July 30, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: June 18, 2015Complaint filed.
Date: June 18, 2015Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. filed.
Date: June 26, 2015Summons filed.
Date: June 18, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2022 |
Case reassigned to 43 effective 10/10/2022 . Case |
||
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 43 effective 10/10/2022 . | |
January 12, 2020 |
This case is reassigned from department 39 to department 31 for Case Management Program. Case |
||
February 26, 2017 |
This case is reassigned from department 36 to department 39 for Case Management Program. Case |
||
June 02, 2016 |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . Scheduling |
||
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . | |
March 02, 2016 |
Order Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Thereon Document |
||
March 02, 2016 |
Order - Other (Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Thereon) filed. Filed By: California Bank & Trust (Plaintiff) Document |
||
March 02, 2016 |
Order Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Thereon California Bank & Trust (Plaintiff) |
||
March 02, 2016 |
Order - Other (Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Thereon) filed. Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.