Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mohamed, Shirley M., Mohamed Sr, Joseph, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by John E Cassinat, against Tsakopoulos-Kounalakis, Eleni, Tsakopoulos, Angelo K., Tsakopoulos Family Partnership, The City Of Rancho Cordova, Sunridge Anatolia, (total of 9) See All represented by Adam U Lindgren, Mark A Serlin, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions789 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time971 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - partial filed.
Date: November 08, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2015-10-16T00:00:00Statement - Other (ISO MSJ) filed.
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Judgment (of quiet title and declaratory relief) filed.
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of MSJ) filed.
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:003DCA order dismissing appeal
Date: December 13, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed.
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Abandonment of Appeal
Date: October 31, 2017Response (to Plntf's Separate Statement ISO MSJ) filed.
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Proposed Judgment filed.
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Opposition (to MSJ/SA) filed.
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: October 10, 2017Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order - Other (for Shortening Time on Cross-Motion SJ) filed.
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Opposition (to Plntf's MSJ) filed.
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Reply (in support MSJ/SA) filed.
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Stipulation Only - Other (Joint Sitp of Facts in support of Cross-Moitons for SJ) filed.
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Response (to Sunridge's Separate Statement ISO of MSJ) filed.
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Order - Other (Order Granting Stipulation to Shorten Time on Cross-Motions for Summary Jrdgment) filed.
Date: 2017-05-01T00:00:00Stipulation (For Dismissal of Parties Irrevocably Disclaiming all rights title or interest) filed.
Date: 2015-10-09T00:00:003DCA Remittitur issued, appeal is dismissed
Date: February 13, 2018Statement - Other (in support of MSJ) filed.
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Reply (Brief in support of Mohamed's MSJ) filed.
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment filed.
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Filing Notice of abandonment of Appeal
Date: December 05, 2017Answer filed.
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Proposed Order (on Cross MSJ) filed.
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO MSJ) filed.
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Order After Hearing (on cross motions for summary judgment) filed.
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of John E Cassinat in support of Motion for Attoney Fees) filed.
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees filed.
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: October 24, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Motion for Attorneys Fees) filed.
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirming Letter - 11/15/17 hearing dropped from calendar) filed.
Date: November 14, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.