Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Florez, Reina E., filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Usa Multifamily Inc, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1079 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1079 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Returned - CMP Minute Order
Date: 2016-03-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Correspondence (Returned Mail) filed.
Date: December 01, 2017Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2015-12-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.