Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
May, Kenneth, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by William M Lyons, against Does 1-100, Jones, James H., Kenyon, Nicholas James, The Regents Of The University Of California, Uc Davis Medical Center, (total of 5) See All represented by Kat Todd, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with James P. Arguelles presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions208 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Cycle Time498 days |
Stipulation (To Dismiss Individually Named Defendants) filed.
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00Order - Other (Re: Stipulation to Dismiss) filed.
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: April 29, 2016Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: November 24, 2015Complaint filed.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: May 12, 2016Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.