Beecham, Karene,
filed a(n)
Economic Torts -
Torts
case
against
Regus Management Group Llc,
Leibforth, Stephanie,
Does 1-10,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Details for
Beecham, Karene v. Regus Management Group Llc
, et al.
Case Events for
Beecham, Karene v. Regus Management Group Llc
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
March 05, 2015
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/03/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
Judge: David W. Abbott
March 05, 2015
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
March 05, 2015
Docket Event
Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
February 10, 2015
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
February 10, 2015
Docket Event
Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
January 02, 2015
Docket Event
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/03/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .
Judge: David W. Abbott
January 02, 2015
Docket Event
Beecham, Karene Application for Waiver granted in full on 01/02/2015 .
January 02, 2015
Docket Event
Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 01/02/2015 .
January 02, 2015
Docket Event
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.