Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Emily Pierce, against Javinar, Melissa S., Does 1 To 25, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 14, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions43 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time45 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: May 27, 2014Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed.
Date: April 14, 2014Statement of Venue filed.
Date: April 14, 2014Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: April 30, 2014Summons filed.
Date: April 15, 2014Declaration - Other filed.
Date: April 14, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2014-04-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.