Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Burton, Jeb U., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alexis G Ortega, Laurel Dein, against Does 1-25, Hart Nibbrig, Leonard C., Law Office Of Leonard C Hart, Rowzee, Steven, represented by Jason J Sommer, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions113 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time202 days |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support) filed.
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Filing Notice of Abandonment of Appeal
Date: July 21, 2014Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: June 09, 2014Reply (Memorandum in Support of Anti-SLAPP Motion) filed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Anti-SLAPP Motion) filed.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Motion for SLAPP filed.
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support) filed.
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support) filed.
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: June 13, 2014Order - Other (Order Granting Defendants' Anti-Slapp Special Motion to Strike) filed.
Date: 2014-04-23T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal) filed.
Date: 2014-04-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Alexis G Ortega in Support of Opposition to Anti-SLAPP Motion) filed.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2014-05-16T00:00:00Abandonment of Appeal (Unlimited Civil Case)
Date: July 16, 2014Summons filed.
Date: 2014-01-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Order After Hearing submitted by Hart Nibbrig, Leonard C rejected on 04/17/2014 .
Date: 2014-04-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs) filed.
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jason J Sommer in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs) filed.
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Table of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs) filed.
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees filed.
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.