Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shepard, Louvina, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by David Graulich, against Advanced Call Center Technologies Llc, Does 1-100, represented by Derek S Sachs, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions402 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time430 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-08-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: February 05, 2015Complaint filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-08-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Summons submitted by Shepard, Louvina rejected on 01/17/2014 .
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2014-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: September 11, 2014Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: September 24, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.