Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Emily Pierce, against Dreyer, Jennifer, Does 1-25, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions452 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time459 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: December 30, 2013Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: August 11, 2014Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed.
Date: December 30, 2013Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: March 27, 2015Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 13, 2014Summons filed.
Date: January 16, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-12-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.