Sampaguita Llc,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
against
Beauchamp, Roxanne,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Details for
Sampaguita Llc v. Beauchamp, Roxanne
Case Events for
Sampaguita Llc v. Beauchamp, Roxanne
Date
Type
Description
March 28, 2014
Docket Event
Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights) filed.
March 14, 2014
Docket Event
Order - Other (Order for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights) filed.
March 12, 2014
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/12/2014 02:00:00 PM .
March 12, 2014
Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Civil Law and Motion Heard
Judge: David I. Brown
March 06, 2014
Docket Event
Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Hearing on Petition forr Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights) filed.
March 03, 2014
Docket Event
Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 03/12/2014 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: David I. Brown
January 30, 2014
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing filed.
December 30, 2013
Docket Event
Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights) filed.