Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lockhart, Jessica, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Jay S Rothman, against Sutter Health Sacrmento Sierra Region, Sutter Community Hospital, Does 1-50, represented by Michael J Christian, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 14, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions667 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time705 days |
Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: May 11, 2015Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-02-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: June 12, 2015Answer filed.
Date: 2013-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2014-02-19T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-08-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2013-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: April 06, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.