Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Greg Padilla Bail Bonds, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by John Van Doren, against Griffin, Cecilia, Gales, Myron K., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with James P. Arguelles presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 19, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1020 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1064 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2013-07-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: June 03, 2016Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: March 02, 2016Summons submitted by Greg Padilla Bail Bonds rejected on 08/08/2014 .
Date: August 08, 2014Summons submitted by Greg Padilla Bail Bonds rejected on 08/07/2013 .
Date: 2013-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2013-10-25T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2013-11-08T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-08-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2013-07-19T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: May 04, 2016Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: January 02, 2014Default denied as to Griffin, Cecilia on Complaint .
Date: May 04, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.