Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Timothy S Brown, against Laskosky, Mike, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions435 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time441 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: March 07, 2014Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed.
Date: December 27, 2012Statement of Venue filed.
Date: December 27, 2012Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-12-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: January 31, 2013Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 19, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.