O'Daniel, Melissa,
filed a(n)
General Torts -
Torts
case
against
Sente Group Inc,
Rodriguez, Brandon,
Massage Envy Llc,
Does 1-50,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Details for
O'Daniel, Melissa v. Sente Group Inc
, et al.
Case Events for
O'Daniel, Melissa v. Sente Group Inc
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
July 17, 2013
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
July 17, 2013
Docket Event
TSP Referral - Clock Start Calendar scheduled for 10/24/2013 at 09:00:00 PM in Department CV_UNIT at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
July 17, 2013
Docket Event
Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .
July 11, 2013
Hearing
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program Heard
Judge: David W. Abbott
July 11, 2013
Docket Event
Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.
July 11, 2013
Docket Event
Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.
July 11, 2013
Docket Event
Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 07/11/2013 08:30:00 AM .
July 02, 2013
Docket Event
Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/11/2013 08:30:00 AM published .
July 02, 2013
Tentative Ruling
No appearance is required under the following conditions: This case is referred to Trial Setting Process for selection of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference dates. All counsel (including partie...
Judge: David W. Abbott
June 25, 2013
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.