Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nancy Su, against Stathos, Rick R., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions132 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time194 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: December 28, 2012Complaint filed.
Date: December 28, 2012Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: May 09, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 20, 2013Summons filed.
Date: January 30, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.