Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fresno Credit Bureau, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by John D Suhr, against Does 1-10, Arrington, Latrecia, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions98 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time903 days |
Declaration - Other (Pre-Judgment Interest) filed.
Date: April 08, 2013Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 17, 2013Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: June 22, 2015Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: April 08, 2013Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2013-02-25T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-01-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Request for Attorney fees) filed.
Date: April 08, 2013Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed.
Date: April 08, 2013Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2013-04-08T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2013-04-08T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sac) Issued
Date: October 29, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: February 11, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.