Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by John D Guerrini, against Does 1-10, Roberts, Perry R., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2370 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: June 24, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2013-03-25T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-01-30T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2013-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2013-03-04T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2013-03-25T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: October 25, 2013Declaration - Other (Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: 2013-03-25T00:00:00Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: February 26, 2014Writ of Execution submitted by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc rejected on 11/07/2013 .
Date: November 07, 2013Declaration - Other (Re: Interest Calculations) filed.
Date: 2013-03-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: September 06, 2018Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: September 26, 2018Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: June 28, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.