Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Eining, Cheryl, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Paul V Bossenmaier, against Winco Foods Inc, Does 1-100, represented by James W Pincin, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions599 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time604 days |
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: August 22, 2014Answer filed.
Date: May 13, 2013Complaint filed.
Date: December 31, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: January 30, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.