Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Karen Etsell Lusis, against Yount, Christopher, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions254 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time287 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: September 06, 2013Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed.
Date: December 26, 2012Summons filed.
Date: January 30, 2013Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-12-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 20, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.