Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Laura M Hoalst, against Does 1-10, Taglies, Darlene, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions378 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time383 days |
Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: January 10, 2014Trial Brief filed.
Date: January 10, 2014Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-06-10T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - After Trial filed.
Date: January 10, 2014Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-01-30T00:00:00Declaration of Due Diligence filed.
Date: 2013-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2013-05-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: 2013-07-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Short Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 01/10/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-01-10T00:00:00Certification for Short Cause Matters filed.
Date: 2013-09-03T00:00:00Exhibit List filed.
Date: 2014-01-10T00:00:00Memo of Costs (not posted - Proof of Service of Memo of Costs not signed)
Date: January 15, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.