Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Anita H Singh, against Pena, Trisha A., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time193 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: May 13, 2013Complaint filed.
Date: December 31, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: January 30, 2013Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: February 20, 2013Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed.
Date: May 08, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.