Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vion Holdings Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vijay S Desai, against Does 1-10, Saenz, Jamiquan C., Saenz, Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with James M. Mize presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions95 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1558 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: April 02, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-28T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: April 02, 2013Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2013-02-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 1033(b)) filed.
Date: April 02, 2013Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2013-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2013-02-15T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-01-30T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: November 21, 2013Declaration - Other (Interest) filed.
Date: 2013-04-02T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: April 04, 2017Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: November 26, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.