Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cook, Judith A., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Robert J Enos, against Sato, Douglas N., Does 1-20, Cook, Patrick K., All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Title, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions153 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time214 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-12-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: 2013-05-29T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-03-21T00:00:00Answer submitted by Sato, Douglas N rejected on 03/20/2013 .
Date: 2013-03-20T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2013-02-25T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: June 27, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.