Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lina M Michael, against Randhawa, Rajinder, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions146 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time866 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: March 25, 2014Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2012-12-26T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-12-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2013-11-20T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2013-02-27T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: September 29, 2014Summons filed.
Date: 2013-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-12-26T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: March 25, 2014Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 11, 2015Declaration - Other (Plaintiffs Waiver of Cost) filed.
Date: March 25, 2014Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES) Issued
Date: September 29, 2014Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2014-03-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.