Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Casillas, Julia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nicholas Anderson, against Mcconnell, Daniel S., Mcconnell, Cindy, Does 1-25, represented by Shiela F Gonzales, Jeffrey M. Schaff, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael G. Virga presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael G. Virga Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions808 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time819 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2013-04-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: February 03, 2015Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2014-08-12T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2014-08-21T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-11-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: January 23, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-11-06T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-01-08T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference And Order To Appear) filed.
Date: 2013-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2014-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: 2014-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: December 18, 2014Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: November 19, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.