Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Andrew Ford, against Gonzalez, Fabian, Does 1-20, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1168 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Case Cycle Time1176 days |
Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: August 12, 2015Demurrer filed.
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended) filed.
Date: December 19, 2012Summons filed.
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Summons (First Amended) filed.
Date: February 26, 2013Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: July 18, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.