Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
I Q Data International Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Eric J Medel, against Rose, Jacinta A., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time497 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: May 31, 2012Answer filed.
Date: June 25, 2012Complaint filed.
Date: May 31, 2012Summons filed.
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: June 11, 2012Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: September 11, 2013Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Denied) filed.
Date: June 28, 2012Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.
Date: July 18, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.