Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sheila Shahriyarpour, against Borsdorf, Thomas, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 29, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions75 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time120 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: March 29, 2012Complaint filed.
Date: March 29, 2012Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: July 18, 2012Summons filed.
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: April 18, 2012Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: June 12, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.