Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lum, Brenda, Dolliver-Lum, Robert Anthony, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Matthew P Donahue, against Roes 1-50, Roes 1-20, Does 1-25, Crane, Eden Mathew, Baptista, Mark, (total of 6) See All represented by Matthew C Jaime, Richard A Swenson, Julia V Islas, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial732 days |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions728 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time761 days |
Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-05-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint submitted by Crane, Eden Mathew rejected on 06/13/2012 .
Date: 2012-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00Order - Other (Order on Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2013-02-05T00:00:00Response (Response to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine) filed.
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motions in Limine) filed.
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00Trial Brief filed.
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/11/2012 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-02-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 01/31/2014 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2014-01-31T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-05-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2014-01-24T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to compel) filed.
Date: 2012-11-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2013-01-07T00:00:00Statement - Other (of Disputed Questions..) filed.
Date: 2012-11-15T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-06-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2012-06-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: February 21, 2014Request for Dismissal With Prejudice - Cause of Actions: filed.
Date: 2012-10-19T00:00:00Reply (brief) filed.
Date: 2012-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00Order of Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2014-01-13T00:00:00Order of Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2014-01-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2013-12-26T00:00:00Response (Response to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine Nos. 9 - 12) filed.
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Settlement) filed.
Date: 2014-01-13T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: March 05, 2014Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-07-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-10-19T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2012-08-09T00:00:00Joinder in Motion (in Mark Baptista's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement) filed.
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2013-11-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Alan Shonkoff PhD in Support of Reply Brief to Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00Statement of Case filed.
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-11-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-09-21T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2013-12-17T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2012-02-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2012-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2012-04-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: 2012-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2012-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2012-06-15T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2012-06-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Further Deposition Testimony) filed.
Date: 2012-11-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Matthew C Jaime) filed.
Date: 2012-11-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Alan Shonkoff) filed.
Date: 2012-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2012-11-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec of Stephen Rapaski) filed.
Date: 2012-11-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: 2013-02-11T00:00:00Notice - Other (to Appear at Trial to Def Mark Baptista) filed.
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Notice - Other (to Appear at Trial to Def) filed.
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00Exhibit List (Amended Exhibit List) filed.
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00Witness List filed.
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00Proposed Jury Instructions filed.
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/04/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/05/2014 09:00:00 AM .
Date: February 05, 2014Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2014-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: 2014-01-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.