Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Paul Martin vs. Costco Wholesale Corporation
On January 30, 2012 an antitrust/trade regulation case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 30, 2012
Last Refreshed
May 16, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Raymond M. Cadei;Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Antitrust
Matter Type
General Antitrust
Status
Other
Case Duration
4 years, 1 month and 30 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Approving Final Disbursement of Settlement Funds and Sidmissing Action With Prejudice) filed. |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order - Other (Approving Final Disbursement of Settlement Funds and Dismissing Action with Prejudice) filed. |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Chase M Stern in support of Stip Approving Final Disbursement of Settlement) filed. |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of L Stephens Tilghman Appointed Class Settlement Administrator Providing Final Accounting for the Distribution of Settlement Funds) filed. |
|
September 03, 2015 | hearing |
Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement - Complex Heard Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Final Approval order) filed. |
|
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement - Complex heard on 09/03/2015 01:30:00 PM . |
|
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement - Complex set on 09/03/2015 01:30:00 PM published . |
|
September 02, 2015 | Tentative Ruling | Martin v. Costco - Case No. 34-2012-00118165 - Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Service Award The Court issues the following tentative rulin...
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Other ((Proposed) Final Approval Order) filed. |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Unopposed Motion For Final Approval of Class Settlement And Award of Attorneyhs' Fees, Cost, and Service Award) filed. |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING filed. |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration of Will Lemkul in Support of Unopposed Motion For Final Approval of Class Settlement and Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service Award) filed. |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion (Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion For Final Approval of Class Settlement And Award of Attorneys Fees, Cost, and Service Award) filed. |
|
May 21, 2015 | hearing |
Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement - Complex Heard Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Preliminary Approval Order) filed. |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement - Complex heard on 05/21/2015 02:00:00 PM . |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement - Complex scheduled for 09/03/2015 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
The Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement - Complex is scheduled for 09/03/2015 at 01:30 PM in Department 35.
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement - Complex set on 05/21/2015 02:00:00 PM published . |
|
May 18, 2015 | Tentative Ruling | Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement The Court issues the following tentative ruling for the hearing on May 21, 2015 at 2:30 p.m. on plaintiff Martins unopposed motion for preli...
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion - Other (Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement; Memorandum; Declaration of Chase M. Stern; [Proposed] Preliminary Approval Order; and [Proposed] Final Approval Order) filed. |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement) filed. |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration of Chase M. Stern in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement) filed. |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed. |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Certify a Class Action - Complex scheduled for 05/21/2015 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement - Complex scheduled for 05/21/2015 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement - Complex rescheduled to 05/21/2015 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement - Complex scheduled for 04/28/2015 at 10:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
January 15, 2015 | hearing |
Status Conference - Complex Heard Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
The Motion to Certify a Class Action - Complex is scheduled for 05/21/2015 at 01:30 PM in Department 35.
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Certify a Class Action - Complex scheduled for 05/21/2015 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Complex heard on 01/15/2015 01:45:00 PM . |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
The Status Conference - Complex is scheduled for 01/15/2015 at 01:45 PM in Department 35.
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Status Conference - Complex scheduled for 01/15/2015 at 01:45:00 PM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for heard on 12/30/2014 04:11:00 PM . |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
July 03, 2014 | hearing |
Motion - Other - Complex Heard Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Complex heard on 07/03/2014 01:30:00 PM . |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion - Other - Complex scheduled for 07/03/2014 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Email/Overnight Courier) filed. |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Reply (Defendants FNA Group, Inc and Costco Wholesale Corporation's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Order Granting Class Certification; Reply Declaration of Stacey H Wang & Exhibit "A" in Support) filed. |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Response (Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Class Definition) filed. |
|
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration of Christina Sosa) filed. |
|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Defendants FNA Group, Inc and Costco Wholesale Corporation's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Order Granting Class Certification; Declaration of Stacey H Wang & Exhibit "A" in Support Thereof) filed. |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for heard on 05/22/2014 04:42:00 PM . |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Request - Other (Defendants FNA Group, Inc. and Costco Wholesale Corporation's Request for Hearing Pursuant to Minute Order Dated May 7, 2014) filed. |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Objection (Defendant's FNA Group, Inc. and Costco Wholesale Corporation's Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Order Granting Motion for Class Certification Declaration of S. Wang in Support Thereof) filed. |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Ruling on Objection to Plaintiff's Propoased Order Granting Motion for Class Certification) filed. |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed. |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
April 22, 2014 | hearing |
Motion for Protective Order - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion for Protective Order - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/22/2014 09:00:00 AM . |
|
April 18, 2014 | hearing |
Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/18/2014 09:00:00 AM . |
|
April 17, 2014 | hearing |
Motion for Protective Order - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion for Protective Order - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/17/2014 09:00:00 AM . |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Reply (memo in support of Motion for Protective Order prohibiting the dep of FNA Cheif Exe Officer G Alexander) filed. |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
April 11, 2014 | hearing |
Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/11/2014 09:00:00 AM . |
|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 04/18/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Withdrawl of Motion) filed. |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Opposition (to def FNA Goups Motion for a protective order) filed. |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition) filed. |
|
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 04/22/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion for Protective Order filed. |
|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (in Support) filed. |
|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of withdraw of Motion for Protective Order noticed for April 17, 2014 and re-setting motion to April 22nd) filed. |
|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Notice and Request for Continued Motion to Compel) filed. |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion for Protective Order submitted by FNA Group Inc rejected on 03/27/2014 . |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 04/17/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Request - Other (Continuance) filed. | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Amended Motion to Compel Deposition of Gus Alexander) submitted by Martin, Paul rejected on 03/26/2014 . |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion for Protective Order filed. |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 04/11/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel - Other (Depostiion of Gus Alexander) filed. |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Christina Sosa) filed. |
|
March 13, 2014 | hearing |
Motion to Certify a Class Action - Complex Heard Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion to Certify a Class Action - Complex heard on 03/13/2014 09:00:00 AM . |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Motion to Certify a Class Action - Complex set on 03/13/2014 09:00:00 AM published . |
|
March 12, 2014 | Tentative Ruling | Motion for Class Certification, filed by Plaintiffs The following is a copy of the tentative ruling for the hearing on March 13, 2014 at 9:00 am. Because of the nature of this hearing appearances are ...
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
February 21, 2014 | hearing |
Motion to Certify a Class Action - Complex Heard Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion to Certify a Class Action - Complex heard on 02/21/2014 03:00:00 PM . |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Certify a Class Action - Complex scheduled for 03/13/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
The Motion to Certify a Class Action - Complex is scheduled for 03/13/2014 at 09:00 AM in Department 35.
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
February 07, 2014 | hearing |
Motion to Certify a Class Action - Complex Heard Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion to Certify a Class Action - Complex heard on 02/07/2014 04:02:00 PM . |
|
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition (Reply to Opposition to Motion for Class Certification) filed. |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration of John Pianetto in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Class Certification) filed. |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (declaration of Patrick McClintock in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Class Certification) filed. |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration of Stacey Wang in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Class Certification) filed. |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration of William Fischer in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Class Certification) filed. |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other ([Redacted] Declaration of Dr. Keith Ugone in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Class Certification) filed. |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Opposition (Defendants FNA Group, Inc. and Costco Wholesale Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification) filed. |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Index of Evidence in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Class Certification |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Order Sealing Portions of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification) filed. |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Stipulated Protective Order) filed. |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation (App for Court Order to Seal Portions of Motion) filed. |
|
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (Protective Order Governing Documents and Information) filed. | |
December 06, 2013 | hearing |
Status Conference - Complex Heard Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Redacted-Notice of and Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration & Exhibits Attached) filed. |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Complex heard on 12/06/2013 11:00:00 AM . |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration of Christina Sosa) filed. |
|
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. |
|
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement - Complex scheduled for 02/21/2014 at 03:00:00 PM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Amended Stipulated Protective Order) filed. |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status Conference - Complex scheduled for 12/06/2013 at 11:00:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status Conference - Complex rescheduled to 12/06/2013 at 11:00:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Status Conference - Complex continued to 12/06/2013 at 11:00 in this department. | |
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Complex heard on 05/03/2013 11:30:00 AM . |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Notice of Status Conference) filed. |
|
January 25, 2013 | hearing |
Status Conference - Complex Heard Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
The Status Conference - Complex is scheduled for 05/03/2013 at 11:30 AM in Department 35.
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status Conference - Complex scheduled for 05/03/2013 at 11:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Complex heard on 01/25/2013 11:30:00 AM . |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order - Amended |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for heard on 12/19/2012 03:39:00 PM . |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
This case is reassigned to department 35 for Complex Case Management.
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Status Conference - Complex scheduled for 01/25/2013 at 11:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Status Conference - Complex reassigned to for 01/25/2013 at 11:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for heard on 12/11/2012 10:59:00 AM . |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Designated a complex action on 10/22/2012 . | |
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 13 effective 10/19/2012 . | |
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Designated as an exceptional action on 10/22/2012 . | |
October 19, 2012 | hearing |
Status Conference - Civil Special Sets Heard |
|
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Status Conference - Civil Special Sets scheduled for 01/25/2013 at 11:30:00 AM in Department 13 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated . | |
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 10/19/2012 09:30:00 AM . |
|
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event | The Status Conference - Civil Special Sets is scheduled for 01/25/2013 at 11:30 AM in Department 13. | |
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. |
|
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Amended Stipulated Protective Order) filed. |
|
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Stipulated and Protective Order) filed. |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Notice of Rescheduled Case Management Conference) filed. |
|
September 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Status Conference - Civil Special Sets scheduled for 10/19/2012 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 13 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated . | |
September 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Status Conference - Civil Special Sets rescheduled to 10/19/2012 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 13 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
September 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Notice of CMC) filed. |
|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (Stipulated Protective Order) filed. | |
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | The Status Conference - Civil Special Sets is scheduled for 10/12/2012 at 09:00 AM in Department 13. | |
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Status Conference - Civil Special Sets scheduled for 10/12/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 13 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated . | |
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for heard on 09/05/2012 02:56:00 PM . |
|
August 23, 2012 | hearing |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program Heard Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
August 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 08/23/2012 08:30:00 AM . |
|
August 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. |
|
August 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/23/2012 08:30:00 AM published . |
|
August 20, 2012 | Tentative Ruling | No appearance is required under the following conditions: The above-entitled action is transferred to department 13 for consideration of complex designation. The plaintiff is ordered to contact the cl...
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement submitted by Martin, Paul rejected on 08/16/2012 . |
|
August 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Notes generated . | |
August 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. |
|
June 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/23/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer filed. |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Martin, Paul rejected on 04/25/2012 . |
|
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer filed. |
|
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Williams, Rihcard T added as a effective 04/02/2012 . | |
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Martin, Paul rejected on 03/19/2012 . |
|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons issued . | |
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons submitted by Martin, Paul rejected on 02/02/2012 . |
|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 35 .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|