Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
State of California, Employment Development Department vs. Re...
On November 01, 2011 a limited civil case was filed by State Of California, Employment Development Department, represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Resendez, Gabriela M., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 01, 2011
Last Refreshed
May 21, 2024
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Shelleyanne W. L;Category
(Other Employment Complaint Case)
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
1 year, 11 months and 16 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: Feb 24, 2022Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: Feb 24, 2022Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: Feb 24, 2022Writ - Return
Date: Oct 17, 2013Writ - Return
Date: Oct 17, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: Oct 17, 2013Notice Entry of Judgment amp; Abstract of Judgment
Date: Nov 01, 2011Notice Entry of Judgment amp; Abstract of Judgment
Date: Nov 01, 2011Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2022 | RECEIPT | ||
February 24, 2022 | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed. Filed By: State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) | ||
February 24, 2022 |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Disposition |
||
February 24, 2022 |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Assignment |
||
February 24, 2022 |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed. Filed By: State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) Document |
||
February 24, 2022 |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) |
||
February 24, 2022 |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed. Document |
||
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed. | |
October 17, 2013 | Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed. Filed By: State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) | ||
October 17, 2013 |
Writ - Return Disposition |
||
October 17, 2013 |
Writ - Return Assignment |
||
October 17, 2013 |
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed. Filed By: State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) Document |
||
October 17, 2013 |
Writ - Return State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) |
||
October 17, 2013 |
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed. Document |
||
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed. | |
June 21, 2013 | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. Filed By: State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) | ||
June 21, 2013 |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest Disposition |
||
June 21, 2013 |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest Assignment |
||
June 21, 2013 |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. Filed By: State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) Document |
||
June 21, 2013 |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) |
||
June 21, 2013 |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. Document |
||
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. | |
June 20, 2012 | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. Filed By: State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) | ||
June 20, 2012 |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest Disposition |
||
June 20, 2012 |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest Assignment |
||
June 20, 2012 |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. Filed By: State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) Document |
||
June 20, 2012 |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) |
||
June 20, 2012 |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. Document |
||
June 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment . | |
November 01, 2011 | Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed. Filed By: State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) | ||
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment . | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
November 01, 2011 |
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment . Disposition |
||
November 01, 2011 |
Notice Entry of Judgment & Abstract of Judgment Disposition |
||
November 01, 2011 |
Notice Entry of Judgment & Abstract of Judgment Assignment |
||
November 01, 2011 |
Case assigned to Hon. Christopher E. Krueger in Department 54 Hall of Justice Assignment Judge: Shelleyanne W. L. Chang |
||
November 01, 2011 |
Judgment entered . Judgment |
||
November 01, 2011 |
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment . Disposition |
||
November 01, 2011 |
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed. Filed By: State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) Document |
||
November 01, 2011 |
Notice Entry of Judgment & Abstract of Judgment State of California, Employment Development Department (Plaintiff) |
||
November 01, 2011 |
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed. Document |
||
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed. |