Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Farm General Insurance Company, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Darrel K. Yasutake, against Whirlpool Corporation, Oem Miller, Does 1-25, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions80 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time96 days |
Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: March 01, 2012Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: March 19, 2012Complaint filed.
Date: December 30, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 06, 2012Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed.
Date: February 03, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.