Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fia Card Services Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert Scott Kennard, against Does 1-15, James Iii, Clarence, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond M. Cadei Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions175 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1284 days |
Request for Dismissal (unjust enrichment) filed.
Date: 2012-06-22T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: December 24, 2012Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2012-10-25T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: January 26, 2015Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2012-06-22T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-05-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-06-22T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2012-06-22T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2012-06-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (waiver of interest and atty fees) filed.
Date: 2012-06-22T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2012-10-25T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside Default (and Judgment) filed.
Date: 2012-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: December 24, 2012Declaration - Other (of M D Kahn) filed.
Date: December 24, 2012Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: June 08, 2015Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: August 14, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.