Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ryan E Vos, against Sciara, Jennifer L., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions161 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time162 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: November 30, 2011Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: May 09, 2012Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: May 10, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: December 19, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.