Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Wallin, Loren M., Wallin, Aurora, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Stephen P. Acquisto presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2484 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: February 03, 2012Declaration - Other (Case Summary) filed.
Date: February 03, 2012Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: February 03, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-12-19T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: February 03, 2012Correspondence (Bks Notice) filed.
Date: May 19, 2018Writ of Execution Issued
Date: May 21, 2012Correspondence (BKS Notice) filed.
Date: July 17, 2018Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2012-02-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Interest) filed.
Date: 2012-02-03T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: February 15, 2013Correspondence (BKS Notice) filed.
Date: September 18, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.