Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Best Service Co Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark Garen, against Does 1-10, Greco, Jayne E., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 21, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions99 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1393 days |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2012-05-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: July 11, 2012Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: September 14, 2015Declaration - Other (RE Written Agreement and Guaranty) filed.
Date: 2012-03-09T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2012-02-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE Copies in Lieu of Original Documents) filed.
Date: 2012-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2012-01-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed.
Date: 2012-03-09T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2012-03-09T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2012-03-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2012-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: 2012-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption submitted by The Best Service Co Inc rejected on 07/02/2012 .
Date: 2012-07-02T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2012-05-07T00:00:00Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: November 14, 2014Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: July 09, 2014Order - Other (Order-Claim of Exemption Hearing) filed.
Date: July 20, 2012Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: November 10, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.