Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Anita H Singh, against Canseco, David O., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 21, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time371 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: February 06, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-12-09T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: November 26, 2012Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: February 06, 2012Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: March 15, 2012Writ of Execution Issued
Date: April 05, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.